Governing Board
Our Governing Board
The Governing Board of Rumworth School is totally committed in supporting the school to provide a high quality, rounded educational experience that prepares our learners for life.
Headteacher
Jennifer Dunne
Chair of Governors
Lawrence Lilley
Co-Opted Governors | Parent Governors | Staff Governor | LA Governor |
Christine Bleasdale | Aydin Zorlutuna | Rebecca Fletcher | Carol Martin |
George Lawson | Margaret Bradshaw | ||
Andrew Morgan | Jacqui Latham |
Declarations of Interest
Name | Member Type | Appointed By | Business/Other Interests | Financial Interests | Other Governor Roles | Dates and Terms of Office |
Jennifer Dunne | Headteacher | Governing Board | None | None | None | 01/09/2023 - |
Lawrence Lilley | Chair | Governing Board | None | None | None | 10/07/2024 - 12/12/2025 |
Carol Martin | LA Governor | Local Authority | None | None | None | 08/11/2023 - 07/11/2027 |
Rebecca Fletcher | Staff | Satff Election | None | None | None | 09/07/2023 - 08/07/2027 |
Andrew Morgan | Co-Opted | Governing Board | None | None | None | 18/01/2024 - 17/01/2028 |
Christine Bleasdale | Co-Opted | Governing Board | None | None | None | 11/05/2024 - 10/05/2028 |
George Lawson | Co-Opted | Governing Board | None | None | None | 26/11/2023 - 25/11/2027 |
Aydin Zorluntana | Parent | Parent Election | None | None | None | 05/10/2022 - 06/10/2026 |
Margaret Bradshaw | Parent | Parent Election | None | None | None | 04/05/2023 - 03/05/2027 |
Jacqui Latham | Parent | Parent Election |
None |
None |
None |
26/05/2023 - 25/05/2027 |
Committees and Governor Responsibilities
Name | Member Type | Committees | Governor responsibilities/ Link Governor Roles |
Jennifer Dunne | Headteacher | Headteacher on all committees | |
Lawrence Lilley |
Chair | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
Wholeschool Curriculum, English Curriculum, Finance and School budget planning, Pupil Premium, Looked After Children, Quality of Education, Student Progress and Attainment, Strategic Development. |
Carol Martin | LA Governor | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
|
Rebecca Fletcher | Staff | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
|
Andrew Morgan | Co-Opted | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
|
Christine Bleasdale | Co-Opted | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
Professional Development and Training, Wellbeing and Mental Health, Wholeschool Pastoral Support. |
George Lawson | Co-Opted | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
Building and Premises, Health and Safety, Professional Development and Training, Strategic Development, Preparation for Adulthood Curriculum, CEIAG Business and Enterprise, Health and Safety. |
Aydin Zorlunta | Parent | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
Building and Premises, Communication and Stakeholder Engagement |
Margaret Bradshaw | Parent | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
|
Jacqui Latham | Parent | School Effectiveness Committee, Resources Committee |
Governing Board Attendance Record 2023-2024
Name | Member Type | 08/11/23 | 14/12/23 | 07/02/24 | 20/03/24 (Postponed till 17/04/24) |
Jennifer Dunne | Headteacher | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Dr.Sam Fox | Chair | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Lawrence Lilley | Vice Chair | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Carol Martin |
LA Governor | Y | Apologies Received |
Apologies Received |
Apologies Received |
Rebecca Fletcher | Staff | Y | Y | Y | Apologies Received |
Andrew Morgan | Co-Opted | N/A | N/A | Y | Y |
Christine Bleasdale | Co-Opted | Apologies Received |
Apologies Received |
Y | Y |
George Lawson | Co-Opted | Y | |||
Lorraine Ellis | Co-Opted | Y | Apologies Received |
Apologies Received |
Y |
Aydin Zorlunta | Parent | Y | Apologies Received |
Y | Y |
Margaret Bradshaw | Parent | Apologies Received |
Y | Y | Y |
Jacqui Latham | Parent | Y | Y | Y | Apologies Received |
Governing Board Attendance Record 2022-2023
Name | Member Type | 09/11/22 | 14/12/22 | 01/02/23 | 17/05/23 | 12/07/23 |
Gary Johnson | Headteacher | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Lorraine Ellis | Chair | Y | Apologies Received |
Y | Y | Y |
Dr.Sam Fox | Vice Chair | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Susan Bannister | LA Governor | Y | Y | Y | N | N |
Emma Brock | Staff | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Christine Bleasdale | Co-Opted | Y | Y | Y | N | Y |
George Lawson | Co-Opted | Y | Y | Y | Y | Y |
Lawrence Lilley | Co-Opted | Y | Apologies Received |
Y | Y | Apologies Received |
Aydin Zorlunta | Parent | Y | Apologies Received |
Y | Y | Y |
Sarah Catherall | Parent | Absent, no apologies | Absent, no apologies | Absent, no apologies | Absent, no apologies | N/A |